Financial history HERTFORDSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 232686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £201.64k £178.81k £184.31k £195.76k £164.28k
Total expenditure £198.57k £201.84k £206.11k £251.97k £239.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.50k N/A £1.55k £32.34k