Financial history THE SOCIETY FOR DISTRIBUTING HEBREW SCRIPTURES

Charity number: 232692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £557.20k £538.14k £979.11k £530.75k £473.16k
Total expenditure £527.69k £556.50k £456.35k £393.09k £464.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £547.73k £513.53k £968.04k £520.05k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £9.47k £10.56k £11.07k £8.16k N/A
Income - Other £0 £14.05k £0 £2.54k N/A
Income - Legacies £117.35k £60.63k £474.93k £77.95k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £526.56k £555.37k £455.05k £391.97k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.13k £1.12k £1.30k £1.12k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.41k £13.92k £10.73k £10.32k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £1.13k £1.12k £1.30k £1.12k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A