Trustees LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 232709
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Rev Malcolm McMahon Chair 01 May 2014
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
CHRIST'S AND NOTRE DAME COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
Dr Margaret Goddard Trustee 26 November 2021
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Rev Canon Aidan Prescott Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
Colette O'Brien Trustee 05 November 2020
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Carol Lawrence Trustee 05 November 2020
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY
Received: On time
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
USHAW TRUST
Recently registered
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (SHREWSBURY DIOCESE) INC
Received: On time
Sean Christopher Keyes Trustee 05 November 2020
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Ian Hollows Trustee 05 November 2020
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Graeme Michael Easton Trustee 05 November 2020
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Rev Mgr John Peter Devine OBE Trustee 24 October 2019
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
Rev Canon Michael Fitzsimons Trustee 24 October 2019
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
Rev Matthew Nunes Trustee 22 September 2016
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
REV Provost ANTHONY O'BRIEN Trustee
ARCHDIOCESAN PROPERTY SERVICES LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF LIVERPOOL METROPOLITAN CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Rev PHILIP INCH Trustee
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
Rt Rev THOMAS NEYLON Trustee
APOSTLESHIP OF THE SEA LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN COUNCIL
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days
RT REV THOMAS WILLIAMS Trustee
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESAN EDUCATION TRUST
Overdue by 33 days