Accounts and annual returns THE LANGTREE TRUST

Charity number: 232924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window