Financial history THE LANGTREE TRUST

Charity number: 232924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £50.10k £106.44k £352.37k £142.44k £34.19k
Total expenditure £54.14k £126.98k £321.00k £154.50k £37.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A