TRUSTEES FOR THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF. NEVERS

Charity number: 233299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £39.80k £54.30k £37.51k £44.70k £40.23k
Total expenditure £42.94k £47.23k £46.56k £46.89k £41.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A