CONGREGATION OF PRIESTS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS OF BETHARRAM

Charity number: 233335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £349.47k £322.92k £370.55k £526.33k £356.27k
Total expenditure £372.82k £338.82k £285.52k £420.01k £410.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £340.61k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £53.01k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £117.92k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £14.80k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £185.79k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £385.55k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £34.46k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £32.65k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £34.46k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A