WARHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 233576
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 102 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 August 2020 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required