WARHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 233576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Polly Hanson Smith Trustee 26 January 2015 None on record
MR Jon Smith Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
ANN JOYCE MASSINGHAM Trustee 08 January 2018 None on record
Samantha Rose Cooke Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
Christopher David Cooke Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
ALFRED WILLIAMSON Trustee 04 April 2012 None on record