Accounts and annual returns STONY STRATFORD AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 233610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required