Accounts and annual returns JOSEPH SCOTT'S CHAPEL CHARITY

Charity number: 233648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window