Financial history THE BENEFIT FUND FOR A E I CABLES EMPLOYEES

Charity number: 233693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.61k £11.07k £2.85k £9.05k £19.21k
Total expenditure £11.83k £8.43k £11.84k £18.23k £12.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A