Dogfen lywodraethu THE MEDICALERT FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 28 JULY 1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 JUNE 1979, 7 JUNE 1995, 2 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS INCLUDING (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY COMMUNICATING PERSONAL AND MEDICAL INFORMATION ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS TO MEDICAL AND EMERGENCY PROFESSIONALS AND BY PROVIDING A MEANS WHEREBY ITS MEMBERS MAY BE IDENTIFIED AS THOSE TO WHOM SUCH INFORMATION HELD BY IT RELATES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND TO SAVE AND PROTECT LIVES
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.