THE WYGGESTON LODGE CHARITY

Charity number: 233738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 January 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required