BARONESS ROLLE'S WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 233855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £645 £465 £520 £530 £538
Total expenditure £1.47k £2.71k £1.39k £695 £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A