Financial history EMILY LYTTELTON AND UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 233895
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/06/2018 04/06/2019 04/06/2020 04/06/2021 04/06/2022
Total gross income £849 £652 £652 £676 £690
Total expenditure £0 £750 £750 £0 £26
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A