Financial history CLARETIAN MISSIONARIES TRUST

Charity number: 234026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £537.34k £561.10k £328.00k £420.45k £361.35k
Total expenditure £328.78k £407.23k £395.06k £464.25k £391.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £78.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £196.44k £216.26k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £321.44k £328.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £10.46k £7.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £8.99k £8.52k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £216.26k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £328.78k £407.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.90k £8.68k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A