Financial history THE MAIDENHEAD CENTRE FOR THE HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 234254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.41k £19.41k £16.06k £16.06k £12.13k
Total expenditure £23.52k £18.17k £16.33k £16.33k £8.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A