Financial history THE METROPOLITAN AND CITY POLICE ORPHANS FUND

Charity number: 234787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.09m £1.09m £1.10m £1.18m £1.12m
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.09m £1.17m £1.27m £1.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £389.18k £418.15k £452.09k £74.42k £442.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £703.20k £668.39k £652.04k £703.55k £677.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £398.96k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £57.42k £74.42k £25.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £987.39k £1.09m £1.18m £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.24k £105.61k £81.25k £89.49k £88.06k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £126.67k £121.98k £123.81k £137.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £25.35k £25.28k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £77.27k £81.12k £81.11k £82.14k
Expenditure - Other £121.52k £0 £0 £0 £0