Accounts and annual returns JIREH STRICT BAPTIST CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 235243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 December 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2020 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required