CHARITY OF JOSHUA COX

Charity number: 235260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.66k £1.82k £1.82k £1.94k £1.91k
Total expenditure £835 £960 £960 £960 £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A