Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY ICW ST JOHN'S CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 235521
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window