SALHOUSE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 235690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required