THE LITTLE WAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 235703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.24m £4.19m £3.25m £5.23m £1.88m
Total expenditure £2.67m £2.87m £2.27m £2.79m £2.89m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.22m £4.16m £3.22m £5.16m £1.81m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £12.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.56k £7.21k £19.70k £50.54k £44.49k
Income - Other £8.37k £23.89k £11.92k £1.45k £25.66k
Income - Legacies £1.38m £2.34m £0 £3.36m £607.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.58m £2.78m £2.27m £2.50m £2.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £90.44k £92.04k £0 £91.91k £69.71k
Expenditure - Governance £16.60k £15.61k £22.00k £29.31k £31.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.52m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £198.68k £265.71k