Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TIVERTON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 235757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.32k £31.00k £54.31k £13.22k £17.52k
Total expenditure £5.02k £91.76k £8.36k £70.64k £4.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A