JOHN A THOMPSON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 235784
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £308.50k £281.18k £277.89k £281.40k £284.15k
Total expenditure £329.60k £325.63k £293.72k £291.13k £306.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A