Trustees THE IRISH GENEALOGICAL RESEARCH SOCIETY
Charity number: 235886
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN CHARLES SMYRL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN KEOGH | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Michael Quirk | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Murphy | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Reddan | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Boulden | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Hatche | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Aloysius Gorry | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Norman Graham Goold | Trustee | 11 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUTLER PHD | Trustee | 08 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JILL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER MANNING FIGRS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD JOHN ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mary Teresa Casteleyn | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Bernadette Cass | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAIRE MACCONGHAIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.