EATON FUND FOR ARTISTS, NURSES AND GENTLEWOMEN

Charity number: 236060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 01 February 2017 On time Download