ELEVENTH CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 236093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £381.98k £194.27k £151.32k £175.16k £69.07k
Total expenditure £161.73k £148.35k £185.25k £180.25k £124.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A