MUNICIPAL CHARITIES OF DOVER

Charity number: 236140
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 August 2016 On time Download