Trustees MUNICIPAL CHARITIES OF DOVER
Charity number: 236140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hill | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Marie Wright | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam wood | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Martin Raven | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John William Bird | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Biggs | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Corke Jenner Mrs | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIE LESLEY GORDON | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MARGARET BERESFORD | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY BRIVIO | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|||||
ROGER STEPHEN WALKDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.