MEDINA VALLEY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 236153
Charity reporting is up to date (97 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 February 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 February 2021 97 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time Download