MEDINA VALLEY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 236153
Charity reporting is up to date (97 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £410.97k £351.97k £344.40k £504.44k £388.80k
Total expenditure £419.53k £386.10k £453.25k £525.30k £428.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £119.55k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £384.89k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £511.23k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £14.07k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.33k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A