Trustees THE CHARITY OF MRS CATHERINE BOVEY FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLES AND OTHER BOOKS IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF FLAXLEY, IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER.

Charity number: 236296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT JOHN CHARLES ENSOR Trustee 20 April 2017
CHARITY OF CATHERINA BOVEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINISTER
Received: On time
Diana Mary Bowyer Trustee 31 August 2016
MRS CATHERINA BOVEY FUND FOR APPRENTICING
Overdue by 600 days
CHARITY OF CATHERINA BOVEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINISTER
Received: On time
David Matthams Trustee 02 April 2014
MRS CATHERINA BOVEY FUND FOR APPRENTICING
Overdue by 600 days
CHARITY OF CATHERINA BOVEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINISTER
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Charles Taylor Trustee 07 February 2014
THE UGLY DUCKLING COMPANY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CATHERINA BOVEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MINISTER
Received: On time
MRS CATHERINA BOVEY FUND FOR APPRENTICING
Overdue by 600 days
Margaret Albinia Joanna Swinley Trustee 01 January 2007
MRS CATHERINA BOVEY FUND FOR APPRENTICING
Overdue by 600 days
THE FRIENDS OF FLAXLEY CHURCH
Received: On time