THE ESTCOURT CHARITY OF LONG NEWNTON

Charity number: 236437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £647 £700 £714 £727 £742
Total expenditure £1.11k £1.05k £710 £980 £630
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A