Financial history UNITED CHARITY OF PALLING BURGESS AND OTHERS

Charity number: 236440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.43k £1.07k £2.12k £2.17k £2.19k
Total expenditure £3.24k £1.41k £2.31k £2.31k £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A