THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL

Charity number: 236803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.74m £8.51m £9.60m £9.09m £8.82m
Total expenditure £10.15m £10.74m £10.46m £11.16m £10.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £102.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.76m £2.29m £2.94m £2.52m £2.21m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.87m £5.08m £5.50m £5.57m £5.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £980.47k £1.02m £1.04m £967.67k £773.58k
Income - Other £134.58k £125.95k £126.35k £36.02k £157.95k
Income - Legacies £394.68k £177.06k £864.06k £354.48k £93.95k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.12m £10.70m £10.43m £11.07m £10.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.29k £36.17k £24.50k £93.87k £152.44k
Expenditure - Governance £66.33k £91.40k £77.28k £116.87k £71.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £234.59k £645.92k £269.55k £201.83k £392.67k
Expenditure - Investment management £35.29k £36.17k £24.50k £93.87k £152.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0