Trustees THE KENDAL UNITARIAN CHAPEL TRUST
Charity number: 236829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAZEL YVONNE CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL THOMAS DYER | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Catherine Blunt | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Crompton | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John L Campbell | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATIE HALL | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Pickering | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|||||
FREDERICK JORDAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOCELYN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.