Accounts and annual returns L G HARRIS TRUST

Charity number: 237048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 09 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 11 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window