CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, HIGH WYCOMBE AND MAIDENHEAD

Charity number: 237379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £14.86k £16.29k £24.98k £19.68k £24.92k
Total expenditure £21.71k £20.35k £33.79k £33.11k £46.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A