Accounts and annual returns THE ABBEYFIELD SHANKLIN SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 237811
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 October 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 01 October 2019 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 24 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window