Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD SHANKLIN SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 237811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £181.22k £194.23k £202.11k £199.55k £219.78k
Total expenditure £174.99k £181.47k £214.09k £221.43k £220.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.42k £8.11k