CHARITIES OF HENRY SMITH AND OTHERS

Charity number: 237888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.87k £3.35k £3.40k £2.66k £3.33k
Total expenditure £3.16k £2.60k £2.60k £2.80k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A