LADY CHARLES BRUCE'S TOOTING CHARITY

Charity number: 238033
Charity reporting is overdue by 1792 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 331 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 May 2021 560 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 697 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 February 2021 840 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1062 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 December 2020 1149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1792 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1792 days