THE REVEREND GEORGE GLEED FOR ELEEMOSYNARY PURPOSES

Charity number: 238281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £29 £31 £31 £32 £33
Total expenditure £25 £32 £32 £34 £22
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A