FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 238685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 06 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 December 2019 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 December 2019 143 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 September 2017 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2017 51 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 19 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 19 March 2016 On time Download