Financial history FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, LONDON

Charity number: 238685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £292.00k £402.61k £403.73k £328.59k £373.74k
Total expenditure £282.75k £351.52k £381.93k £462.96k £328.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A