SIR WALTER MOYLE'S ALMSHOUSES, ST GERMANS

Charity number: 238800
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Kilborn Chair 06 September 2017 None on record
Rev Lynn Parker Trustee 12 September 2019
NICHOLAS HONY'S CHARITY Received: On time
Patricia Pipe Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
Brenda Daw Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
Briony Woods Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record