Accounts and annual returns WINWICK PARISH CHARITY

Charity number: 238997
Charity reporting is overdue by 429 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Annual return 01 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 429 days
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 429 days
Annual return 01 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2018 06 March 2020 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2017 Not Required