Financial history WINWICK PARISH CHARITY

Charity number: 238997
Charity reporting is overdue by 421 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/12/2015 01/12/2016 01/12/2017 01/12/2018 01/12/2019
Total gross income £1.72k £2.20k £607 £729 £751
Total expenditure £379 £659 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A